Sharma, Sandeep Kumar (CPSO#: 66427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 440
2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 849-8855
Fax: (905) 849-6683
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandeep K. Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 66427 )

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 440
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDEEP KUMAR SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1998