Sharma, Sanjay (CPSO#: 64253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock II 224B
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2227
Fax: (613) 544-5707
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 64253 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
224B - 166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1993