Sharma, Satyendra (CPSO#: 66085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Himachal Pradesh University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 15A
951 Wilson Street
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: (416) 746-7016
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-9531
Fax: 416-603-2388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

13291 YONGE STREET, SUITE # 300
Oak Ridges ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: 905-773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

491 Lawrence Ave W, Suite 201
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: 416-256-0600
Fax: 416-256-0602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

900 The East Mall
Suite 102
Etobicoke ON  M9B 6K2
Canada
Phone: 4166950480
Fax: (416) 695-0486
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

197 Third St
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5
Canada
Phone: 905-373-1227
Fax: 905-373-4062
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

264 McNabb St, Main Fl
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 705-254-3312
Fax: 705-450-6459
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

1849 Yonge Street
Unit LF 20
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: 416-920-3737
Fax: 416-920-7848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Satyendra Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 66085 )

Business Address:
LF 20 - 1849 yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 920-3737

Business Address:
201 - 491 Lawrrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 256-0600

Business Address:
300 13291 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
301 - 295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Business Address:
102 - 900 East Mall
Toronto ON  M6K 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 695-0480

Business Address:
197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5
Phone Number: (905) 373-1227

Business Address:
Suite 15A
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 746-3012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATYENDRA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1992