Sharma, Shalini (CPSO#: 83997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Russian, Urdu

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
567 Scenic Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 1G9
Phone: (905) 667-7001
Fax: (905) 667-7002
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shalini Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 83997 )

Business Address:
567 Scenic Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 667-7001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHALINI SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Jan 2006 to 01 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Jan 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2007