Sharma, Shiv Ram (CPSO#: 63358)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Agra University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Michael Ramprasad Dawes Family Practice and Walk In Comprehensive Health Care Network 2772 Danforth Avenue Toronto ON M4C 1L7 (416) 690-1042
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Sharma has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.