Sharma, Sunjay Vishnu (CPSO#: 86562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44721
Fax: (905) 575-2576
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunjay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 86562 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNJAY VISHNU SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014