Sharma, Supriya (CPSO#: 69827)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 1996 to 05 May 1996
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1998 to 08 Feb 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2008