Sharma, Suraj Ashok (CPSO#: 90870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. S. Sharma Medical Prof. Corp.
Suite 224
217 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: 519-304-7003
Fax: 519-304-8007
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

824 Coxwell Ave.
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suraj Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 90870 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 9EN-200
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SURAJ ASHOK SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013