Sharma, Vinay (CPSO#: 100549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Dr, unit 1
Brampton ON  L7A 3Y6
Phone: 905-840-2008
Fax: 905-840-2002
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma ( CPSO# 100549)
Dr. P. Kahlon ( CPSO# 100767)

Business Address:
107 - 10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone Number: (905) 793-3311

Business Address:
Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Drive
Unit 1
Brampton ON  L6A 3Y6
Phone Number: (905) 840-2008

Business Address:
Dixie and Queen Walk in Clinic
14 Lisa Street
Unit 11
Brampton ON  L8T 4W2
Phone Number: (905) 456-2751


Corporation Name: Dr.Kahlon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma ( CPSO# 100549)
Dr. P. Kahlon ( CPSO# 100767)

Business Address:
Storybook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Drive
Unit 1
Brampton ON  L7A 3Y6
Phone Number: (905) 840-2008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Vinay Sharma may practise medicine independently in family medicine.