Sharma, Vinod Kumar (CPSO#: 54691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone: (519) 576-0204
Fax: (519) 576-1237
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vinod Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2007


Corporation Name: Vinod Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma ( CPSO# 54691 )

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
203 - 535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 576-0204

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINOD KUMAR SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1986