Sharman, Suneel (CPSO#: 79763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Lower Simcoe Street
Infinity Health Centre
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone: (416) 504-0628
Fax: (416) 504-2009
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Apr 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNEEL SHARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006