Sharpe, Christopher John (CPSO#: 85604)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2006 to 17 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2007 to 25 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010