Shaul, Charles Harvey (CPSO#: 16226)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: KMH 340 College Street Toronto, ON M5T 3A9
Date Received: 23 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1957
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014