Shaver, Charles Stuart (CPSO#: 25817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
Unit 4, 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 695-8900
Fax: (613) 695-8901
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Shaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shaver ( CPSO# 25817 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
Unit 4, 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2E 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 695-8900

Business Address:
Box 11063, Station H
Ottawa ON  K2H 7T8
Phone Number: (613) 825-1147

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 1970 to 24 Jun 1971
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1971 to 30 Jun 1972
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 3 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  April  30,  2018,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Charles  Stuart
            Shaver, in accordance  with  an  undertaking and consent given by Dr. Shaver to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. CHARLES STUART SHAVER
                                          ("Dr. Shaver")
                  
                                                to
                  
                  THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Shaver, certificate of  registration  number 25817, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information  regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (2)   I,  Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that the College initiated  an  investigation
                  bearing  File Number 7214695 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in  professional   misconduct   or  am  incompetent  in  my  practice  of
                  Cardiology, including the interpretation of resting and stress ECGs.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Shaver, understand and agree  that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (4)   I, Dr. Shaver, executed an Undertaking with the College on April 22, 2014
                  (the  "April 22, 2014 Undertaking"), which  replaced  and  superseded  an
                  undertaking  I  executed  with  the  College  on  February  13,  2013  in
                  resolution  of  an investigation into my practice (the "February 13, 2013
                  Undertaking").  Once signed, this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the
                  April 22, 2014 Undertaking.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I will restrict my medical practice
                        to ambulatory outpatient internal medicine.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shaver,  undertake  and  agree not to supervise stress tests
                        and nuclear stress tests, or to interpret  ECGs  in  respect of any
                        patient.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I shall not seek privileges
                        at any hospital in any jurisdiction.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Shaver,  undertake  and  agree  that I shall not supervise
                        medical residents.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shaver, undertake to inform the College  of  each  and every
                        location  that  I  practise including, but not limited to clinic(s)
                        and  office(s),  in any  jurisdiction  (collectively  my  "Practice
                        Location(s)"), within 15 days of executing this Undertaking.  Going
                        forward, I further  undertake  to inform the College of any and all
                        new Practice Locations within 15  days  of  commencing  practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I will submit to,  and  not
                        interfere  with,  unannounced  inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College  representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Shaver, give my irrevocable  consent  to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance  Plan  and/or
                        any  person  or institution that may have relevant information,  in
                        order for the  College  to  monitor my compliance with the terms of
                        this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that  I  have  executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Shaver, undertake to comply with the terms  and conditions of this
                  Undertaking  and  acknowledge  that a breach by me of any  term  of  this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute an act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may  result  in  a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses,   etc.   arising   from   the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I,  Dr.  Shaver,  acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions  provided  in  this  Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained  independent  legal  counsel  in reviewing  and  executing  this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (10)  I,  Dr.  Shaver,  acknowledge  that this Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my  certificate  of  registration  for the
                  purposes  of  section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to  the  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended.

            (11)  I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge  that,  in  addition to this Undertaking being
                  posted in accordance with section (10) above, the following summary shall
                  be  posted  on  the Public Register during  the  time  period  that  this
                  Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr.  Shaver's  practice  is  restricted  to  ambulatory  outpatient
                        internal medicine.  Dr. Shaver agrees not to supervise stress tests
                        and nuclear  stress  tests,  or  interpret  ECGs  in respect of any
                        patient.   Dr.  Shaver  agrees not to seek hospital privileges  and
                        shall not supervise medical residents.  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Shaver, give my irrevocable  consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with  similar  responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location, with any information the College  has  that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Stuart Shaver to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 30, 2018:

Dr. Shaver’s practice is restricted to ambulatory outpatient internal medicine. Dr. Shaver agrees not to supervise stress tests and nuclear stress tests, or interpret ECGs in respect of any patient. Dr. Shaver agrees not to seek hospital privileges and shall not supervise medical residents.