Shaver, Laurie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: Scaldwell, Laurie Elizabeth (used until: 07 Mar 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
63 Brown Wood Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M5
Phone: 705 718 9600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. James and Laurie Shaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shaver ( CPSO# 52755 )
Dr. L. Shaver ( CPSO# 52986 )

Business Address:
63 Brown Wood Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M5
Phone Number: (705) 718-9600

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE ELIZABETH SHAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1985