Shaw, Brian Matthew (CPSO#: 56964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr Brian shaw Medical Professional
111 Main St West Suite 404
North Bay
North Bay ON  P1B4T4
Phone: 7054767400
Fax: (705) 476-2585
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

663 Birchwood Rd
North bay
North Bay ON  P1B4T4
Canada
Phone: 705-471-9492
Fax: 705-476-2585
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shaw ( CPSO# 56964 )

Business Address:
404 - 111 Main Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2T6
Phone Number: (705) 476-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MATTHEW SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jul 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987