Shaw, Bruce Harry (CPSO#: 56117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
751 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 570-2198 Ext. 310
Fax: (519) 570-3405
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.H. Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shaw ( CPSO# 56117 )

Business Address:
751 Victoria Street South
Suite B100
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 742-2636

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE HARRY SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986