Shaw, James Channing (CPSO#: 77197)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy Levinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shaw ( CPSO# 77197 )
Dr. W. Levinson ( CPSO# 77144 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
LKSKI, 3rd Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Medical Records Location

Address: Womens College Hospital Division of Dermatology 76 Grenville Street Toronto, ON M5S 1B2
Date Received: 11 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 04 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015