Shaw, Jennifer Robin (CPSO#: 53920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7 Short Hills Avenue
Short Hills NJ  07078
United States
Phone: (973) 376-0202

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ROBIN SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 1988 to 11 Apr 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 1989 to 31 Mar 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1986