Shaw, Philip Michael (CPSO#: 62236)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993