Shaw, Tammy Yau (CPSO#: 84599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 6084
Fax: (416) 530-6107
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
CPCR Box 209
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 75354
Fax: (613) 737-8688
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tammy Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Shaw ( CPSO# 84599 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6084

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMMY YAU SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009