Shaw-Stiffel, Thomas Alvin William (CPSO#: 51634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Box 255
Room LM11
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79962
Fax: (613) 737-8799
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ALVIN WILLIAM SHAW-STIFFEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW-STIFFEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Incomplete Information

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985