Shawn, Ilana Heather (CPSO#: 97271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
17th Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3090
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mercereau and Shawn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shawn ( CPSO# 97271 )
Dr. P. Mercereau ( CPSO# 97260 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing, 17th Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILANA HEATHER SHAWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2012 to 06 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013