Shawush, Melad Faraj Ramadan (CPSO#: 69370)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000