Shay, George Douglas Paul (CPSO#: 15254)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jain Medical Centre
83A Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3C 2B2
Phone: (204) 783-6265

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1955 to 30 Jun 1956
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999