Shayesteh Alam, Maryam (CPSO#: 85096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SimcoDerm Centre
105 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 503-6333
Fax: (705) 503-6330
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Richmond Hill Medical and
Surgical Centre
Unit 12 Level 2
9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7675
Fax: (289) 597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shayesteh Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shayesteh Alam ( CPSO# 85096 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 503-6333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM SHAYESTEH ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYESTEH ALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)