Shbair, Mahmoud Said Salih (CPSO#: 104767)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sana'a, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2014 to 06 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 07 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 2016