Shea, Alison Kathleen Audrey (CPSO#: 95878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Ave, 8th floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 4165864753
Fax: 4165864699
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON KATHLEEN AUDREY SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017