Shea, Catherine Lynn (CPSO#: 32816)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical records are located at the hospital.
Date Received: 30 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1998 to 31 May 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014