Sheane, Barry John (CPSO#: 99609)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2012 to 28 Jan 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2014