Shear, Perry Alan (CPSO#: 53963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305 Black Rock Turnpike
Fairfield CT  06825
United States
Phone: (203) 337-2629
Fax: (203) 337-2630

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERRY ALAN SHEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988