Shearing, Anthony Denning (CPSO#: 74281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4400 Ext. 3121
Fax: (705) 645-1225
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Shearing and Helen Dempster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dempster ( CPSO# 77921 )
Dr. A. Shearing ( CPSO# 74281 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 788-3623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY DENNING SHEARING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEARING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 12 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2000 to 07 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2001