Shecter, Adam Christopher (CPSO#: 74835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 110
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 829-1414
Fax: (519) 829-2467
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
Emergency Department
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Shecter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shecter ( CPSO# 74835 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 829-1414

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM CHRISTOPHER SHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHECTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2002