Shedden, Peter Mcintyre (CPSO#: 57204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9200 New Trails Dr
Suite 100
The Woodlands TX  77381
United States
Phone: (281) 364-9509
Fax: (281) 364-0984

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MCINTYRE SHEDDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEDDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988