Shedletzky, Carolyn Sarah (CPSO#: 88512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 322-3700
Fax: (416) 322-3707
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abe Shedletzky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shedletzky ( CPSO# 28397 )
Dr. C. Shedletzky ( CPSO# 88512 )

Business Address:
Vanier Centre for Women
Health Care Unit
655 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 5E6
Phone Number: (905) 876-8322

Business Address:
160 Horner Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4X8


Corporation Name: Carolyn Shedletzky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shedletzky ( CPSO# 88512 )

Business Address:
202 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 322-3700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN SARAH SHEDLETZKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEDLETZKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010