Sheehan, Hilarie Louise (CPSO#: 71548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Broom, Hilarie Louise (used until: 02 Nov 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58175
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-8440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 58175
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 34567
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hilarie Sheehan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheehan ( CPSO# 71548 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
B10 - 40 Fingate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 792-8440

Business Address:
103 - 10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 846-7733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARIE LOUISE SHEEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEEHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002