Shehata, Nadine (CPSO#: 69867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 6 502 5
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2296
Fax: (416) 586-8481
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie St, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Canadian Blood Services
67 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 313-4560
Fax: (416) 974-9757
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Shehata Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shehata ( CPSO# 69867 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 6 502 5
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998