Sheik, Syed Hussain (CPSO#: 90143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 13 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2009 to 04 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2010