Sheikh, Adnan Mohammad (CPSO#: 85550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4982
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Riverside campu
1967 Riverside Dr, Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4982
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital General campus
501 Smyth Rd, Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 73663
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial Hospit
66 Louise St, Winchester, ON
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Dept Of Radiology
Renfrew, ON
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sheikh ( CPSO# 85550 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Adnan Mohammad Sheikh may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Radiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Sheikh holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Sheikh no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.