Sheinbaum, Deborah (CPSO#: 57450)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2012