Sheinbaum, Roy (CPSO#: 53896)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015