Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sheiner, Jamie Brenda (CPSO#: 59742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5181
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamie B. Sheiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sheiner ( CPSO# 59742 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
301- 1678 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 975-2300

Business Address:
401 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  M5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 629-4516

Business Address:
727 Hillsdale Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4S 1V4
Phone Number: (416) 932-0446

Business Address:
302 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2G7
Phone Number: (416) 323-0642

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE BRENDA SHEINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEINER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1989