Sheinin, Lisa Basya Judith (CPSO#: 55689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
958 Carlaw Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3M1
Phone: (416) 466-0937
Fax: (416) 423-7353
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

303 Pediatrics
Suite 303
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 466-0937
Fax: (416) 423-7353
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

South Riverdale Community
Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 423-7353
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA BASYA JUDITH SHEININ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEININ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1986