Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sheldon, Karyn Ruth (CPSO#: 67843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (416) 787-3771
Fax: (416) 782-3030
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sheldon ( CPSO# 67843 )

Business Address:
203 - 2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 787-3771

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARYN RUTH SHELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996