Shelig, Khaled Saed (CPSO#: 75801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
1580 20th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5P5
Phone: 5193729951
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khaled Shelig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shelig ( CPSO# 75801 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
1580 20th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5P5
Phone Number: (519) 372-9951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALED SAED SHELIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006