Shelley, Wendy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 27735)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013