Shen, Kay (CPSO#: 70397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Shiu, Kay (used until: 01 Feb 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
100 Stokes Street
Bell Gateway Building
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 6019
Fax: (416) 595-6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAY SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998