Shenava, Ravishankar Thimmangur (CPSO#: 60275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Tulu

Education:Mysore University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 345
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Phone: (519) 977-9550
Fax: (519) 977-9503
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shenava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shenava ( CPSO# 60276 )
Dr. R. Shenava ( CPSO# 60275 )

Business Address:
Suite 345
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 977-9550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Oct 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Shenava’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Shenava engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and in the sexual abuse of eleven patients by, among other things making remarks that were inappropriate and/or of a sexual nature, by touching various parts of his patients’ bodies in a manner that was inappropriate and/or of a sexual nature and by hugging and kissing patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: December 18, 2017 Hearing Dates; February 12-16 and February 26- March 2, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As from October 13, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ravishankar
            Thimmangur Shenava, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Shenava to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. RAVISHANKAR THIMMANGUR SHENAVA 
                                          ("Dr. Shenava")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Shenava, certificate of registration number 60275, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Numbers 98821, 99446,
                  99447, 99449, 100406, 101659 & 7214700, allegations that I engaged in the
                  sexual abuse of patients; and engaged in conduct or an act or omission
                  relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the
                  circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful,
                  dishonourable or unprofessional.

            (4)   I, Dr. Shenava, have read the Notice of Hearing dated May 18, 2016 &
                  September 6, 2017, which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware
                  of the College's concern about protecting the public and I understand the
                  nature of the allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            (8)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the undertaking signed by me on June 14,
                  2016, also continues in force until the matters currently referred are
                  disposed of by a panel of the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (10)  Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter(s)"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction,
                        unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a
                        regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                        "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in
                        this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand
                        that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time,
                        during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or
                        guardian of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                              1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice
                                    Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a
                                    monthly basis; 
                  
                              2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                                    Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                              3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters
                                    with patients, including but not limited to physical
                                    and internal examinations. I further acknowledge my
                                    obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all
                                    of my Professional Encounters with patients, including
                                    physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at
                                    all times; 
                  
                              4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except
                                    those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                                    attached as Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my
                                    Professional Encounters with patients; 
                  
                  
                              5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                                    patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as
                                    Appendix "B" (the "Log");
                  
                              6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                                    patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                              7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                                    basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at all
                        times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (12)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states:
                        "Dr. Shenava must not  have professional encounters, in person or
                        otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                        Dr. Shenava must not be alone during any professional encounter
                        with any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                        website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (13)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I
                        have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (8)(a), above. 
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (18)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (19)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (21)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Shenava is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations that he engaged in the sexual
                              abuse of a patient; and engaged in conduct or an act or
                              omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having
                              regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded
                              by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
                              As a result of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Shenava must not engage in any professional encounters,
                              in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any
                              jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                              continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                              professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other
                              requirements provided in Dr. Shenava's Undertaking with the
                              College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Shenava must
                              not be alone with any patient during any professional
                              encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Shenava shall post a sign in all waiting rooms,
                              examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that
                              states: "Dr. Shenava  must not have professional encounters,
                              in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in
                              the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to
                              the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr.
                              Shenava must not be alone with any patient during any
                              professional encounter. Further information may be found on
                              the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (22)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (24)  I, Dr. Shenava, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (25)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (27)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (28)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.


            (2 of 2)

            As from June 14, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ravishankar
            Thimmangur Shenava, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Shenava to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. RAVISHANKAR THIMMANGUR SHENAVA 
                                          ("Dr. Shenava")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Shenava, certificate of registration number 60275, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File #'s 89197, 96599,
                  97825, 99448 & 7213798, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse of
                  patients and conduct in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the
                  practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would
                  reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or
                  unprofessional. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Shenava, have read the Notice of Hearing dated May 18, 2016, which
                  sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 37 of the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall not engage
                  in any professional encounter with any female patient of any age.

            (8)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practice or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within 15 days of executing
                  this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15 days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (9)   I, Dr. Shenava, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                  sign in my waiting room(s) and each of my examination rooms, in each of
                  my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible location, attached hereto as
                  Appendix "A" that states: "Dr. Shenava must not see female patients or
                  have any professional encounter with any female patient. Further
                  information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                  Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".

            (10)  I, Dr Shenava, undertake that I shall have no communication, direct or
                  indirect, with any complainant in this matter.

            (11)  I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to post a clearly visible certified
                  translation(s) in any language(s) in which I provide services, of the
                  sign described in section (10) in my waiting room(s) and each of my
                  examination rooms of all my Practice Locations in the form set out at
                  Appendix "A."

            (12)  I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                  described in section (10), to the College within 30 days of executing
                  this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Shenava, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                  Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will notify
                  the College prior to providing the services.

            (14)  I, Dr. Shenava, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                  translation(s) described in sections (11) and (12) prior to beginning to
                  provide services in the language(s) described in section (13).

            (15)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (17)  In the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Committee, I,
                  Dr. Shenava, agree that if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (20)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Shenava is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                        Committee into allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of
                        patients and conduct in conduct or an act or omission relevant to
                        the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the
                        circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as
                        disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. As a result of the
                        referral:
                  
                        Dr. Shenava must not engage in any professional encounter with any
                        female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction.  
                  
                        Dr. Shenava shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination room and consulting room, in all his Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:
                        "Dr. Shenava must not see female patients or have any professional
                        encounter with any female patient. Further information may be found
                        on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Shenava, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B".




            (23)  I, Dr. Shenava, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my office(s) and practice(s) and to the inspection of
                  patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Shenava, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ravishankar Thimmangur Shenava to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 13, 2017:

Dr. Shenava is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Shenava must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Shenava’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Shenava must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Shenava shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Shenava must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Shenava must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ravishankar Thimmangur Shenava to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 14, 2016:

Dr. Shenava is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of patients and conduct in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Shenava must not engage in any professional encounter with any female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction.

Dr. Shenava shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination room and consulting room, in all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Shenava must not see female patients or have any professional encounter with any female patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Member
Active Date: February 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions:

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:

While in the course of your medical employment, not to be in the presence of any female patient except in the presence of a member of a regulated health professional with instructions to monitor any patient encounter.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 11, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require, effective May 29, 2015, certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Ravi T. SHENAVA:

(1) on or about January 30, 2015 at the City of Windsor did commit a sexual assault on XX contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code;

(2) between August 9, 2012 and April 1, 2015 at the City of Windsor did commit 5 counts of sexual assault on YY contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code;

(3) between August 9, 2012 and December 31, 2012 at the City of Windsor did, by threats, without reasonable justification or excuse and with intent to obtain an act of sexual intercourse, induce YY to engage in an act of sexual intercourse contrary to Section 346(1) of the Criminal Code;

(4) between November 1, 2012 and April 30, 2013 at the City of Windsor did commit 3 counts of sexual assault on ZZ contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code;

(5) between February 1, 2013 and May 31, 2013 at the City of Windsor did commit a sexual assault on AA contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code;

(6) between May 1, 2010 and May 31, 2011 at the City of Windsor did commit a sexual assault on BB contrary to Section 271(1) of the Criminal Code; and

(7) between August 1, 2014 and October 31, 2014 at the City of Windsor did commit a sexual assault on CC contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: May 26, 2015
Place of charges: Windsor, ON
Windsor Police Service