Shende, Vasanti Nitin (CPSO#: 77185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4-44
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 823-1730
Fax: (519) 823-9639
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shende Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shende ( CPSO# 77185 )

Business Address:
Suite 4-44
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-1730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASANTI NITIN SHENDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 19 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002