Shenderey, Alexander Isaakovitch (CPSO#: 78848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wilderman Medical Clinic
Canadian Centre for Clinical Trials
Accurate Imaging Diagnostics
8054 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  L4J 1W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1212 Ext. 121
Fax: (905) 886-0248
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Shenderey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mezhericher-Shenderey ( CPSO# 99259 )
Dr. A. Shenderey ( CPSO# 78848 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ISAAKOVITCH SHENDEREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENDEREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010